TN HB1998 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau to reimburse certain public or private ground-based ambulance services that bill for transports at a rate not less than 67.5 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers for emergency services and 100 percent of the federal medicare program's allowable charge for participating providers for nonemergency services. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2340 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024