TN HB1991 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Moved to Heel of Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Moved to Heel of Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes businesses to provide for specially marked parking spaces for pregnant women and persons with infants. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As introduced, authorizes businesses to provide for specially marked parking spaces for pregnant women and persons with infants. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-04 - House - HOUSE TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Moved to Heel of Calendar |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2008 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee