TN HB1984 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any program that is a community-based alternative to incarceration to offer to all eligible persons participating in their program information on restoration of voting rights. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 29 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 29 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to restoration of rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1869 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee