TN SB1869 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires any program that is a community-based alternative to incarceration to offer to all eligible persons participating in their program information on restoration of voting rights. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 29 and Title 40, Chapter 35.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 2, Part 1; Title 40, Chapter 29 and Title 40, Chapter 35, relative to restoration of rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1984 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-28 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee