TN HB1976 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts a veteran of the United States armed forces who was trained and certified as a medic or corpsman from the initial licensure fees of the emergency medical services board. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 140, relative to emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1011 | |
2022-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar #2 for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1940 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-11 - Effective date(s) 05/09/2022, 07/01/2022