TN HB1953 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the University of Tennessee, board of trustees for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, extends the University of Tennessee, board of trustees for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1043 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0945) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 82, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2018-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1228) |
2018-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1196) |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2149 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043