TN SB2149 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the University of Tennessee, board of trustees for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, extends the University of Tennessee, board of trustees for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1043 | |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Reset on heel of Regular Calendar 2 4-24-18 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on last calendar of 2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1953 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1043