TN HB1938 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 24 hours to 48 hours following receipt of an allegation of a criminal offense committed against livestock, the time frame within which the commissioner of agriculture, the commissioner's agent, a graduate of an accredited college of veterinary medicine specializing in livestock practice, or a graduate of an accredited college of agriculture with a specialty in livestock must make a probable cause examination of the livestock, otherwise a licensed veterinarian is permitted to make the examination. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 44 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 44 and Title 66, relative to animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1847 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee