TN HB1935 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes certain insureds, or other persons entitled to benefits under a policy, to assign their benefits to a healthcare provider; establishes certain requirements in regard to healthcare facilities collecting out-of-network charges. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, authorizes certain insureds, or other persons entitled to benefits under a policy, to assign their benefits to a healthcare provider; establishes certain requirements in regard to healthcare facilities collecting out-of-network charges. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840 | |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1869 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 840