TN SB1869 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 840
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes certain insureds, or other persons entitled to benefits under a policy, to assign their benefits to a healthcare provider; establishes certain requirements in regard to healthcare facilities collecting out-of-network charges. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes certain insureds, or other persons entitled to benefits under a policy, to assign their benefits to a healthcare provider; establishes certain requirements in regard to healthcare facilities collecting out-of-network charges. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Pub. Ch. 840
2018-05-04 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-04-26SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-17SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-16HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0990)
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0989)
2018-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0826)
2018-04-16HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-04-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-04-02SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2018-04-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0857)
2018-04-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0856)
2018-04-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0764)
2018-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018
2018-03-29SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/2/2018
2018-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
2018-03-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
2018-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2018-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-01-29SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1935 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 840

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback