TN HB1931 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Student Online Personal Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Student Online Personal Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26 Pub. Ch. 757
2016-04-26 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-04-12 Signed by Governor.
2016-04-06HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-04-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-03-31HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-03-30HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-03-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2016-03-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2016-03-23SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2016-03-22HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-03-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-21HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-03-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0885)
2016-03-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016
2016-03-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/15/2016
2016-03-08HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2016-03-02HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2016-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2016-01-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-20HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1900 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback