TN SB1900 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Student Online Personal Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Student Online Personal Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 757 | |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0883) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1931 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 757