TN HB1925 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits the situations in which a wildlife officer may enter private property without the owner's consent to those in which the officer has a warrant, there are exigent circumstances, the officer observed a crime taking place, or another protected class of action that permits an officer's entry onto private property without a warrant occurs. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 69, Chapter 9 and Title 70, relative to powers of the wildlife resources agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2783 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee