TN HB1923 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires judge, when addressing a defendant who intends to plead guilty to a charge of domestic assault, to advise the defendant prior to the plea of the state and federal firearms consequences of such a plea. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires judge, when addressing a defendant who intends to plead guilty to a charge of domestic assault, to advise the defendant prior to the plea of the state and federal firearms consequences of such a plea. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Jud. Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1923&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1923.pdf |