TN HB1922 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 728
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds certain assisted-care living facilities, nursing homes, and emergency communications centers as locations where a newborn safety device may be located. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2, relative to the voluntary surrender of an infant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 728 | |
2024-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-21 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1670 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Effective date(s) 4/19/2024