TN SB1670 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Effective date(s) 4/19/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes changes to the procedure for surrendering custody of an unwanted infant without criminal liability. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2, relative to the voluntary surrender of an infant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-29 Effective date(s) 4/19/2024
2024-04-29 Pub. Ch. 728
2024-04-19SenateSigned by Governor.
2024-04-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2024-04-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2024-04-08SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-04-05SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2024-04-04HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 4
2024-04-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0689)
2024-04-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2024-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-03-28SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2024-03-28SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2024-03-28SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0815)
2024-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024
2024-03-19SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2024-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024
2024-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024
2024-02-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/6/2024
2024-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2024
2024-01-30SenateRefer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2024-01-30SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2024-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2024-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1922 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 728

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback