TN HB1917 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends repeal date for the Go Build Tennessee Program, from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2024; deletes restriction that funds collected from contractor licensing revenue be used only to fund career and technical education programs and other certified and nationally accredited programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 41 and Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends repeal date for the Go Build Tennessee Program, from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2024; deletes restriction that funds collected from contractor licensing revenue be used only to fund career and technical education programs and other certified and nationally accredited programs. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 41 and Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 786 | |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1922 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 786