TN HB1912 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes LEAs to provide up to two days of the required 180 days of classroom instruction through remote instruction in accordance with certain criteria. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to classroom instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897 | |
2022-04-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1887 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022