TN SB1887 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes LEAs to provide up to two days of the required 180 days of classroom instruction through remote instruction in accordance with certain criteria. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to classroom instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 897 | |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-07 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0704) |
2022-04-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 1 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0656) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1912 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 897