TN HB1876 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a statewide building construction standard or another standard or requirement adopted by a local government shall not prohibit or limit the use of equipment with refrigerants, if the equipment contains a refrigerant listed in accordance with safety standards imposed by federal law or rule and is installed in accordance with the use conditions imposed by federal law or rule. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 120, relative to building regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771 | |
2022-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-26 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1801 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022