TN HB1856 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits receipt of state benefits to a business that fails to provide instruction or documents to employees on the right to designate a bargaining representative through secret ballot and the right to not be subject to unfair labor practices, and to grant equal access to its property to employees and proposed bargaining representatives named on an organization election ballot. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 50 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 50 and Title 67, relative to labor.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 2/23/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1796 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee