TN HB1835 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a county trustee to waive penalties and interest for late real property tax payment for up to one week if there was severe weather at the time the tax was due; requires the late taxes be paid within one week of the due date to maintain this waiver. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, permits a county trustee to waive penalties and interest for late real property tax payment for up to one week if there was severe weather at the time the tax was due; requires the late taxes be paid within one week of the due date to maintain this waiver. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1791 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee