TN HB1809 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends eligibility for a Tennessee Promise scholarship to students who are enrolled full-time in a private, for-profit trade school that has been approved by the Tennessee state board of cosmetology and barber examiners to operate in this state for at least 10 consecutive years, that is accredited by the National Accrediting Commission of Career Arts and Sciences, Inc., and that is authorized by the Tennessee higher education commission to offer diploma programs in cosmetology, esthiology, and master barbering. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 7, relative to the Tennessee Promise Scholarship Act of 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/26/2024 |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1752 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee