TN HB1805 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Spencer Bristol Act," which increases the penalty for evading arrest that results in the serious bodily injury of a law enforcement officer to a Class C felony and evading arrest that results in the death of a law enforcement officer to a Class A felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Spencer Bristol Act," which increases the penalty for evading arrest that results in the serious bodily injury of a law enforcement officer to a Class C felony and evading arrest that results in the death of a law enforcement officer to a Class A felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1783 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee