TN SB1783 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Spencer Bristol Act," which increases the penalty for evading arrest that results in the serious bodily injury of a law enforcement officer to a Class C felony and evading arrest that results in the death of a law enforcement officer to a Class A felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Spencer Bristol Act," which increases the penalty for evading arrest that results in the serious bodily injury of a law enforcement officer to a Class C felony and evading arrest that results in the death of a law enforcement officer to a Class A felony. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 16, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1805 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020