TN HB1788 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Failed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-17 - Failed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the application fee for a lifetime handgun carry permit to vary based on the person's age at the time of application and whether the person is a current handgun carry permit holder. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As introduced, changes the application fee for a lifetime handgun carry permit to vary based on the person's age at the time of application and whether the person is a current handgun carry permit holder. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2193 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1788&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1788.pdf |