TN HB1767 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person convicted of aggravated assault or aggravated robbery, committed on or after July 1, 2022, to serve 100 percent of the sentence imposed by the court, or no less than 85 percent of the sentence imposed by the court less sentence reduction credits earned and retained. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to release eligibility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1988 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee