TN SB1988 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person convicted of aggravated assault or aggravated robbery, committed on or after July 1, 2022, to serve 100 percent of the sentence imposed by the court, or no less than 85 percent of the sentence imposed by the court less sentence reduction credits earned and retained. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to release eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1767 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee