TN HB1752 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires public criminal records to be automatically expunged after two years from date of entry of any dismissal, nolle prosequi, or no true bill if not previously expunged upon court order or petition; establishes certain procedures for expunction without cost when charge is dismissed or nolle prosequi is entered. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
As introduced, requires public criminal records to be automatically expunged after two years from date of entry of any dismissal, nolle prosequi, or no true bill if not previously expunged upon court order or petition; establishes certain procedures for expunction without cost when charge is dismissed or nolle prosequi is entered. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1896 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1752&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1752.pdf |