TN HB1748 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, includes East Fork Stables in the definition of premier type tourist resort for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption; designates certain other facility as premier type tourist resort for purposes of sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, includes East Fork Stables in the definition of premier type tourist resort for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption; designates certain other facility as premier type tourist resort for purposes of sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Ketron (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY McNally (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 3 BY Ketron (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY McNally (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 503 | |
2011-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-21 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 62, Nays 23, PNV 2 | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #4 for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 18, Nays 6 | |
2011-05-20 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2011-05-20 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-04-25 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 63, Nays 27, PNV 7 | |
2011-04-21 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0193) | |
2011-04-14 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Reset on reg cal. for 4/21/11 | |
2011-04-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-29 | Re-ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1748 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503