TN HB1739 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state agencies to conduct economic impact analyses of administrative rules on persons residing in or doing business in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires state agencies to conduct economic impact analyses of administrative rules on persons residing in or doing business in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2652 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0