TN HB1719 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022, 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to an assessment on ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2022, 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1052 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 87, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1719 |
2022-04-25 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/26/22 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0921) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1872 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1052