TN HB1703 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows owners and operators of vehicles with an illuminated check engine light to elect to have the tailpipe test performed in lieu of the onboard diagnostics test. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 55, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 201.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows owners and operators of vehicles with an illuminated check engine light to elect to have the tailpipe test performed in lieu of the onboard diagnostics test. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 1; Title 55, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 201.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-06HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
2018-02-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-18HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1492 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback