TN HB1703 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that members of the real estate commission shall not be subject to license forfeiture upon the finding of set fees or commissions on real estate transactions. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that members of the real estate commission shall not be subject to license forfeiture upon the finding of set fees or commissions on real estate transactions. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 2010 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to last calendar | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2009-02-25 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1367 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-21 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1703&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1703.pdf |