TN HB1688 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/07/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/07/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the provision authorizing a municipality or county to pass an ordinance or resolution permitting a person charged with violating certain traffic ordinances or statutes to deposit the person's driver license with the court in lieu of bail. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 8, relative to the deposit of driver licenses in lieu of bail.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Effective date(s) 03/07/2024 | |
2024-03-19 | Pub. Ch. 530 | |
2024-03-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-02-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 6, PNV 1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/15/2024 |
2024-02-12 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar on 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2087 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530