TN SB2087 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the provision authorizing a municipality or county to pass an ordinance or resolution permitting a person charged with violating certain traffic ordinances or statutes to deposit the person's driver license with the court in lieu of bail. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, Part 8, relative to the deposit of driver licenses in lieu of bail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 530 | |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1688 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/07/2024