TN HB1687 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a local board of education to state in its written notice to a teacher who is dismissed or whose contract is not reelected by the board that the only reason for the teacher's dismissal or non-reelection is a loss of funding for the position, if that is the reason for the teacher's dismissal or non-reelection. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 5, relative to teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 678 | |
2022-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2100 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 678