TN HB1657 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 988
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 988
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the real estate commission for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 62, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, extends the real estate commission for two years to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 62, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 988 | |
2018-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1549 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 988