TN HB1633 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a municipal utility board or the municipal governing body, and the comptroller, to establish procedures and guidelines for a natural gas utility system to devote revenues derived from the system to fund chambers of commerce or economic and community organizations; requires certain financial reporting by entities receiving such funds. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Title
As enacted, requires a municipal utility board or the municipal governing body, and the comptroller, to establish procedures and guidelines for a natural gas utility system to devote revenues derived from the system to fund chambers of commerce or economic and community organizations; requires certain financial reporting by entities receiving such funds. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 791 | |
2020-06-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Utilities Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Utilities Subcommittee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Utilities Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Utilities Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1961 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 791