TN HB1629 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes local governments to enter cooperative purchasing agreements with federal agencies; excludes certain purchases. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1205.
Title
As enacted, authorizes local governments to enter cooperative purchasing agreements with federal agencies; excludes certain purchases. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-1205.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 935 | |
2016-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Re-ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | Reset on cal. for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/18/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/11/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1615 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 935
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1629&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1629.pdf |