TN HB1628 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a reward for information leading to the recovery of a civil penalty against a person who knowingly causes any caller identification service to transmit misleading or inaccurate caller identification information to a subscriber with the intent to defraud or cause harm to another person or to wrongfully obtain anything of value. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, creates a reward for information leading to the recovery of a civil penalty against a person who knowingly causes any caller identification service to transmit misleading or inaccurate caller identification information to a subscriber with the intent to defraud or cause harm to another person or to wrongfully obtain anything of value. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0648) |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2020-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1746 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 12/1/2020