TN HB1592 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that certain pension stabilization reserve trusts for state employees and teachers be used exclusively for participants and beneficiaries of the retirement plans; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 10; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 11 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 12.
Title
As enacted, requires that certain pension stabilization reserve trusts for state employees and teachers be used exclusively for participants and beneficiaries of the retirement plans; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 10; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 11 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 590 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1647 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 590