TN HB1589 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Anti-Lunch Shaming Act"; prohibits a school from taking certain actions against a student who cannot pay for a meal, or who has accumulated a meal debt; requires a school to provide a United States department of agriculture reimbursable meal to each student who requests one; requires a school to assist parents and guardians with obtaining free or reduced-price meals for the parent's or guardian's eligible student. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Anti-Lunch Shaming Act"; prohibits a school from taking certain actions against a student who cannot pay for a meal, or who has accumulated a meal debt; requires a school to provide a United States department of agriculture reimbursable meal to each student who requests one; requires a school to assist parents and guardians with obtaining free or reduced-price meals for the parent's or guardian's eligible student. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - HOUSE K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - HOUSE K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Action def. in Education to 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1593 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee