TN HB1582 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a minor league soccer franchise in the United Soccer League to the list of professional sports franchises for which a sports authority may be allocated sales tax revenue. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to the reallocation of the apportionment of sales tax revenue associated with a minor league soccer franchise.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1484 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee