TN HB1567 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the first Friday in October of each year as "Tennessee Manufacturing Day" as a day of special observance. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, Chapter 2, relative to Tennessee Manufacturing Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 132 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Naming & Designating |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0617 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021