TN SB0617 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates the first Friday in October of each year as "Tennessee Manufacturing Day" as a day of special observance. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, Chapter 2, relative to Tennessee Manufacturing Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 132 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1567 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 132