TN HB1565 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that it is not an offense for a manufacturer of gambling devices to knowingly own, manufacture, assemble, design, possess, buy, sell, rent, lease, store, repair, transport, print or make any gambling device or record solely intended for gambling outside of Tennessee and in compliance with federal law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, specifies that it is not an offense for a manufacturer of gambling devices to knowingly own, manufacture, assemble, design, possess, buy, sell, rent, lease, store, repair, transport, print or make any gambling device or record solely intended for gambling outside of Tennessee and in compliance with federal law. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Johnson (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Johnson (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Pub. Ch. 459 | |
2011-06-15 | Effective date(s) 06/10/11 | |
2011-06-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-21 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2 | |
2011-05-21 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #6 for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 5 | |
2011-05-21 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2011-05-21 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-05 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 10, PNVB 8 | |
2011-05-04 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0177) | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Re-referred To: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1740 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 459