TN HB1564 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a volunteer firefighter to receive $600 from the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education for completing 40 hours of training annually. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, allows a volunteer firefighter to receive $600 from the commission on firefighting personnel standards and education for completing 40 hours of training annually. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1582 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018