TN HB1564 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 927
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 927
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "autonomous technology" for purposes of provision whereby no political subdivision may by ordinance, resolution, or any other means prohibit within the jurisdictional boundaries of the political subdivision the use of a motor vehicle equipped with autonomous technology if the motor vehicle otherwise complies with all safety regulations of the political subdivision; clarifies the definition of "autonomous technology" applicable to the provisions governing electronic displays, such as televisions, in motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 47; Title 54, Chapter 1; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, redefines "autonomous technology" for purposes of provision whereby no political subdivision may by ordinance, resolution, or any other means prohibit within the jurisdictional boundaries of the political subdivision the use of a motor vehicle equipped with autonomous technology if the motor vehicle otherwise complies with all safety regulations of the political subdivision; clarifies the definition of "autonomous technology" applicable to the provisions governing electronic displays, such as televisions, in motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 47; Title 54, Chapter 1; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 927 | |
2016-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 1/27/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1561 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 927
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1564&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1564.pdf |