TN HB1558 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes any person licensed as an amateur radio operator eligible to purchase an amateur radio special license plate, rather than allowing only certain persons to purchase such plates. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, makes any person licensed as an amateur radio operator eligible to purchase an amateur radio special license plate, rather than allowing only certain persons to purchase such plates. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1 and Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990 | |
2018-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-01-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1588 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 990